Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Antonio Malabanan Maralit

Bishop of Boac


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1969 BornManila
13 Mar 199525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lipa, Philippines
31 Dec 201445.6AppointedBishop of Boac, Philippines
13 Mar 201545.8Ordained BishopBishop of Boac, Philippines
17 Mar 201545.8InstalledBishop of Boac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Antonio Malabanan Maralit:
Bishop Marcelino Antonio Malabanan Maralit (born ) Bishop of Boac

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Boac.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Dec 2014
  • mn: CB, 7 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Jan 2015
  • c2: CB, 8 Feb 2015
  • i: CB, 27 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 5 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 10 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 12 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015