Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdo Jimeno Ballesteros, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1808BornEpila, Spain
11 Dec 183123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Aug 183931.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
2 Aug 183931.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
29 Jun 184133.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
20 Jun 184537.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Manila, Philippines
13 Nov 184537.7SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
19 Jan 184637.9ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
17 Mar 187264.1DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Jimeno Ballesteros:
Bishop Romualdo Jimeno Ballesteros O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 251, and Page 286
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 327
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 150, Number 822

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015