Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ginés (Ginesio) Barrientos, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637²BornBarrueco Pardo Villa de Sayao
29 Apr 168043.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
29 Apr 168043.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
28 Oct 1681³44.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
13 Nov 169861.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ginés (Ginesio) Barrientos:
Bishop Ginés (Ginesio) Barrientos O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 221, Number 1,374

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013