Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Lino de Ezpeleta

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1701³BornManila
18 Jul 175755.7AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
1 Oct 1759³57.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
1771¹69.2DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Lino de Ezpeleta
Bishop Miguel Lino de Ezpeleta (born , died 1771) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2?: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313
  • ob/c2: CB, 3 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016