Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorio Melitón Martínez Santa Cruz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1815BornPradoluengo, Spain
Jun 1840³25.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Sep 186146.5SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
23 Dec 186146.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
23 Mar 186247.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
30 Sep 187560.5ResignedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
10 Oct 188570.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Melitón Martínez Santa Cruz:
Archbishop Gregorio Melitón Martínez Santa Cruz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manila

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,173
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 168, Number 926
  • bp/d: CB, 18 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015