Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesse Eugenio Mercado

Bishop of Parañaque, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1951 Born
19 Mar 197725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
25 Feb 199745.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Feb 199745.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
31 Mar 199745.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Talaptula
7 Dec 200251.5AppointedBishop of Parañaque, Philippines
28 Jan 200351.6InstalledBishop of Parañaque, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jesse Eugenio Mercado
Bishop Jesse Eugenio Mercado (born ) Bishop of Parañaque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalookan City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parañaque.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,943
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast