Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesus Aputen Cabrera

Bishop Emeritus of Alaminos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1940 BornManila
11 Apr 196423.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 198039.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
5 May 198039.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
1 Jul 198039.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
22 Apr 198544.4AppointedBishop of Alaminos, Philippines
28 Jun 198544.5InstalledBishop of Alaminos, Philippines
1 Jul 200766.6ResignedBishop of Alaminos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jesus Aputen Cabrera:
Bishop Jesus Aputen Cabrera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alaminos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alaminos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jul 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013