Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Mendoza de Leon

Coadjutor Bishop of Antipolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1947 BornParañaque
28 Jun 197528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
27 Jun 200760.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antipolo, Philippines
27 Jun 200760.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
1 Sep 200760.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boseta
25 Jan 201365.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kalookan, Philippines
14 Oct 201568.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kalookan, Philippines
21 Nov 201568.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Antipolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mendoza de Leon:
Bishop Francisco Mendoza de Leon (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Antipolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antipolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,496
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015