Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael James O’Doherty

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1874BornCharlestown, Ireland
30 Nov 189723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Achonry, Ireland
19 Jun 191136.9AppointedBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
3 Sep 191137.1Ordained BishopBishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
6 Sep 191642.1AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
13 Oct 194975.2DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Michael James O’Doherty:
Archbishop Michael James O’Doherty (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013