Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ruperto Cruz Santos

Bishop of Balanga, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1957 Born
10 Sep 198325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
1 Apr 201052.4AppointedBishop of Balanga, Philippines
24 Jun 201052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Balanga, Philippines
8 Jul 201052.6InstalledBishop of Balanga, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ruperto Cruz Santos
Bishop Ruperto Cruz Santos (born ) Bishop of Balanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Rafael - Bulacan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Balanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,661

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast