Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio Santibáñez, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1595AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
3 Aug 1597Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
28 May 1598InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
14 Aug 1598DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Santibáñez
Archbishop Ignacio Santibáñez O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Agustin, Church, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,829
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 109, Number 689
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230
  • ob: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast