Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alejandro Ayson Olalia

Deceased

Archbishop of Lipa, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1913Born
23 Mar 194027.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 194936.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
14 May 194936.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
25 Jul 194936.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
6 May 195037.1SucceededBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
28 Dec 195340.8AppointedBishop of Lipa, Philippines
20 Jun 197259.3AppointedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines
2 Jan 197359.8DiedArchbishop of Lipa, Philippines

MicroData Summary
Alejandro Ayson Olalia
Archbishop Alejandro Ayson Olalia
(born , died )
Archbishop of Lipa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacolor, Archdiocese of Manila
Ordained BishopUniversité Santo Tomas, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 59
  • mn: CB, 2 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025