Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leoncio Leviste Lat

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manila

Titular Bishop of Sila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1917BornMalvar
21 Mar 194224.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 198063.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malolos, Philippines
30 Oct 198063.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sila
29 Jan 198163.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sila
198567.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Dec 199275.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
6 Nov 200285.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leoncio Leviste Lat:
Bishop Leoncio Leviste Lat (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manila

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013