Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mylo Hubert Claudio Vergara

Bishop of Pasig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1962 BornManila
4 Nov 198927.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Manila, Philippines
24 Mar 199027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
28 Aug 200340.8IncardinatedPriest of Cubao, Philippines
12 Feb 200542.3AppointedBishop of San Jose, Philippines
30 Apr 200542.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Jose, Philippines
14 May 200542.6InstalledBishop of San Jose, Philippines
20 Apr 201148.5AppointedBishop of Pasig, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mylo Hubert Claudio Vergara:
Bishop Mylo Hubert Claudio Vergara (born ) Bishop of Pasig

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pasig.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,878

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013