Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hilarión Diéz Fernández, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1761BornValladolid, Spain
3 Apr 182664.5SelectedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
3 Jul 182664.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
21 Oct 182766.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
7 May 182967.5DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Hilarión Diéz Fernández:
Archbishop Hilarión Diéz Fernández O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 251
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 784
  • obl/dl: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014