Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hernando Guerrero, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1572²Born
7 Dec 162654.9SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
17 May 162755.3ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1628²56.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
9 Jan 163462.0AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
1 Jul 164169.5DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hernando Guerrero
Archbishop Hernando Guerrero O.S.A. (born 1572, died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcaraz, Spain

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261, and Page 230
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 151, Number 960
  • bd/bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast