Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jeremiah James Harty

Deceased

Bishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1853Born
28 Apr 187824.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 190349.7AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
15 Aug 190349.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
16 Jan 190450.2InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
16 May 191662.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
29 Oct 192773.9DiedBishop of Omaha, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Jeremiah James Harty (VIAF: 2007747)
Archbishop Jeremiah James Harty (born , died ) Bishop of Omaha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, MO

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast