Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Antonio Rojo del Rio Lafuente y Veiyra

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1708³BornTula, México
19 Dec 175749.2AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
24 Aug 175849.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
22 Jul 175950.8InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
30 Jan 176455.3DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio Rojo del Rio Lafuente y Veiyra
Archbishop Manuel Antonio Rojo del Rio Lafuente y Veiyra (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ln: CB, 23 Aug 2015
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Nov 2016