Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Cruz Bacani, Jr.

Bishop Emeritus of Novaliches, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1940 Born
21 Dec 196525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Iba, Philippines
6 Mar 198444.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
6 Mar 198444.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gauriana
12 Apr 198444.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gauriana
7 Dec 200262.8AppointedBishop of Novaliches, Philippines
16 Jan 200363.0InstalledBishop of Novaliches, Philippines
25 Nov 200363.8ResignedBishop of Novaliches, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Cruz Bacani, Jr.
Bishop Teodoro Cruz Bacani, Jr. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Novaliches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBataan
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novaliches.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,999

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022