Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Sales Reyes y Alicante

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1876Born
23 Sep 190529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
20 Jun 192549.3AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
19 Sep 192549.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
15 Dec 193761.8DiedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francisco Sales Reyes y Alicante
Bishop Francisco Sales Reyes y Alicante (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Caceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaga City

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • c34: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,925, Number 50
  • ln: CB, 3 Aug 2015
  • mn: CB, 21 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast