Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Crisostomo Ayson Yalung

Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1953 BornAngeles City
23 Jun 197925.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 199440.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Mar 199440.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
31 May 199440.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
18 Oct 200147.8AppointedBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
7 Dec 200249.0ResignedBishop of Antipolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Crisostomo Ayson Yalung:
Bishop Crisostomo Ayson Yalung (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antipolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,324
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 20 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 21 Jul 2015