Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino Nozaleda y Villa, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

Titular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1844Born
13 Oct 186117.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
27 May 188945.0AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
13 Apr 189045.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
4 Feb 190257.7ResignedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
14 Nov 190460.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
11 Dec 190561.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
11 Dec 190561.5ResignedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
7 Oct 192783.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Nozaleda y Villa (VIAF: 161023714)
Archbishop Bernardino Nozaleda y Villa O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenya-Nava, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Diocese of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017