Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Villaruz Reyes

Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1941 BornKalibo
21 Dec 196827.3Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
20 Jan 198139.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
20 Jan 198139.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Selsea
3 Apr 198139.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selsea
21 Nov 199251.2AppointedBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
12 Jan 199351.4InstalledBishop of Kalibo, Philippines
7 Dec 200261.3AppointedBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
29 Jan 200361.4InstalledBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
9 Sep 201675.0RetiredBishop of Antipolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Villaruz Reyes
Bishop Gabriel Villaruz Reyes (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antipolo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Sep 2016