Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio de Salamanca

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1737³BornManila
24 Sep 179254.8AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
24 Feb 179456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
Feb 1802³64.1DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio de Salamanca
Bishop Ignacio de Salamanca (born , died Feb 1802) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016