Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Orendain Gaa

Bishop of Novaliches, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1962 Born
23 Sep 200037.9Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
6 Jun 201956.6AppointedBishop of Novaliches, Philippines
22 Aug 201956.8Ordained BishopBishop of Novaliches, Philippines
24 Aug 201956.8InstalledBishop of Novaliches, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Roberto Orendain Gaa
Bishop Roberto Orendain Gaa (born ) Bishop of Novaliches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila, Archdiocese of Manila
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral Basilica, Intramuros, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Novaliches.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2019
  • mn: CB, 6 Jun 2019
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Aug 2019

Quantcast