Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jeronimo Herrera y Lopez

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664BornManila
20 Nov 172460.8AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
11 May 172763.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
Mar 174278.1DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jeronimo Herrera y Lopez:
Bishop Jeronimo Herrera y Lopez , Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015