Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Martelino Reyes

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1892Born
27 Mar 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 193240.3AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
11 Oct 193240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
28 Apr 193442.0AppointedArchbishop of Cebu, Philippines
25 Aug 194957.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Aug 194957.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phulli
13 Oct 194957.5SucceededArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
10 Oct 195260.5DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Martelino Reyes
Archbishop Gabriel Martelino Reyes (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalivo Capiz

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast