Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)

Archidioecesis Cacerensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 3,207 (1,238 Square Miles)
  • Description: The Bicol region
  • Official Web Site: https://www.archdioceseofcaceres.org
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Elias Angeles St., 4400 Naga City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (054)871-3585
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nueva Caceres
14 August 1595ErectedDiocese of Manila Diocese of Nueva Caceres (erected)
Diocese of Cebu (erected)
Diocese of Nueva Segovia (erected)
10 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Caceres
Archdiocese of Manila
Diocese of Lipa (erected)
29 June 1951Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Caceres (Catanduanes and Albay along with the islands of Cagraray, Batán and Rapu Rapu) Diocese of Legazpi (erected)
29 June 1951Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Caceres (Sorsogón and Masbate) Diocese of Sorsogon (erected)
Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
29 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Nueva Caceres (Camarines Norte and Camarines Sur) Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
27 May 1974Territory LostArchdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres) (Camarines Norte) Diocese of Daet (erected)
9 December 1989Territory LostArchdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres) (Saints Philip and James, Saint Joseph, Saint James the Apostle, Saint Peter the Baptist, the Most Holy Trinity, Saint John the Baptist, Sipocot; Saint John the Baptist, San Fernando; Saint Michael the Archangel, Saint Rose of Lima, Saint Bernardine of ...) Territorial Prelature of Libmanan (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nueva Caceres
19501,583,1371,666,45995.0%196232197,2281569110ap1951
Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
1958773,119810,00095.4%92211136,841296155ap1960
19691,082,1871,159,74493.3%106201268,5882210365ap1971
19801,136,0001,201,00094.6%116111278,9442412054ap1981
1990809,206914,25488.5%113121256,4731812640ap1991
19991,026,5451,140,60690.0%132201526,7537214559ap2000
20001,044,2021,160,22490.0%136201566,6937014460ap2001
20011,076,3531,180,29691.2%137211586,8128414460ap2002
20021,097,2891,179,88193.0%142261686,5319511962ap2003
20031,128,2751,200,29394.0%147311786,3389215362ap2004
20041,156,2771,214,57695.2%136251617,18110133366ap2005
20061,183,0331,253,34894.4%168211896,2597925473ap2007
20101,247,0001,288,00096.8%197302275,49313924080ap2011
20121,296,0001,339,00096.8%272748,00013722688ap2013*
20131,418,1791,486,14495.4%199242236,35912024589ap2014
20161,686,9301,772,30095.2%163241879,02115124492ap2017
20191,769,1301,860,00095.1%162231859,56212025893ap2020
20211,903,2791,952,54497.5%173191929,9128218092ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Nueva Caceres
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 114, to Page 115
  • Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 163, to Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 27 May 2024