Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Ramirez Rapadas III

Bishop of Iligan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1972 Born
19 May 199926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ipil, Philippines
13 Jun 201946.9AppointedBishop of Iligan, Philippines
20 Aug 201947.1Ordained BishopBishop of Iligan, Philippines
5 Sep 201947.1InstalledBishop of Iligan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Ramirez Rapadas III
Bishop Jose Ramirez Rapadas III (born ) Bishop of Iligan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTondo, Archdiocese of Manila
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph the Worker, Cathedral, Ipil, Diocese of Ipil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iligan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2019
  • nm: CB, 13 Jun 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Jun 2019
  • c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast