Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Reynaldo B. Getalado, M.S.P.

Superior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1959 Born
4 Aug 198828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mission Society of the Philippines
24 Feb 201454.5AppointedSuperior of Funafuti, Tuvalu, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Reynaldo B. Getalado
Father Reynaldo B. Getalado M.S.P. (born ) Superior of Funafuti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuntinlupa City, Philippines

Please contact the Father through the Mission "Sui Iuris" of Funafuti.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast