Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Crisanto Cardinal Luque y Sánchez

Deceased

Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Cosma e Damiano

Bishop of Colombia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1889Born
28 Oct 191627.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
16 Jan 193141.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tunja, Colombia
16 Jan 193141.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
3 May 193142.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
9 Sep 193243.6AppointedBishop of Tunja, Colombia
14 Jul 195061.4AppointedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
14 Jul 195061.4AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military
12 Jan 195363.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195363.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Cosma e Damiano
7 May 195970.2DiedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Crisanto Luque y Sánchez
Crisanto Cardinal Luque y Sánchez (born , died ) Archbishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTenjo

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast