Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lucas Ramírez Galán, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1715BornBelalcázar, Spain
6 Apr 176145.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena (en España)
6 Apr 176145.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanis
31 May 176145.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanis
12 Jun 176953.7AppointedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
15 Jul 176953.7SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
21 Aug 176953.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
12 Dec 177055.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tui, Spain
19 Mar 177458.4DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lucas Ramírez Galán:
Archbishop Lucas Ramírez Galán O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Tui

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 78, Number 388
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 163, and Page 216
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 391, and Page 421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 26 Oct 2013