Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Claudio Alvarez de Quiñones

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1687¹Born
12 Apr 171730.2AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
1 May 171831.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Jan 172538.0AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
21 Oct 173649.8DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Claudio Alvarez de Quiñones
Archbishop Antonio Claudio Alvarez de Quiñones (born 1687, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá de Henares, Spain

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 36, Number 120
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 38
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187, and Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast