Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé Lobo Guerrero

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1546²Born
12 Aug 159650.6AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
24 Aug 159751.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
19 Nov 160761.8AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
4 Oct 160963.7InstalledArchbishop of Lima, Peru
12 Jan 162276.0DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Lobo Guerrero (VIAF: 86866018)
Archbishop Bartolomé Lobo Guerrero (born 1546, died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRonda, Diocese of Málaga, Spain
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Death PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,831
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 110, Number 696
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187, and Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast