Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino de Almansa Carrión

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1579Born
17 Sep 162950.1AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Dec 1629²50.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
22 Jul 163152.0SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
15 Dec 163152.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
26 Sep 163354.2DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino de Almansa Carrión
Archbishop Bernardino de Almansa Carrión (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Ordained BishopCollege Dona Maria d'Aragon, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176, and Page 187
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,500, Page 152, Number 964
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 20
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,961

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast