Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rubén Isaza Restrepo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1916BornSalamina
29 Oct 193923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
18 Dec 195236.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia
18 Dec 195236.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Badiae
19 Mar 195337.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Badiae
4 Nov 195640.6AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
2 Nov 195943.6AppointedBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
3 Jan 196447.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 Jan 196447.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lares
20 Apr 196751.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
3 Oct 197458.5SucceededArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
15 Mar 198367.0RetiredArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
9 Mar 198771.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rubén Isaza Restrepo:
Archbishop Rubén Isaza Restrepo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cartagena

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013