Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Ignacio Salah Zuleta

Bishop Emeritus of Riohacha, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1942 Born
8 Dec 197229.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 199855.1AppointedBishop of Girardota, Colombia
26 Mar 199855.2Ordained BishopBishop of Girardota, Colombia
13 May 200562.3AppointedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
22 Apr 202077.3RetiredBishop of Riohacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Héctor Ignacio Salah Zuleta
Bishop Héctor Ignacio Salah Zuleta (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Riohacha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá
Ordained BishopCathedral, Girardota, Diocese of Girardota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Riohacha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,260
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Oct 2020

Quantcast