Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mérida

Archidioecesis Emeritensis in Venetiola



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 June 1923
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 8,109 (3,132 Square Miles)
  • Description: Estado Mérida
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdemerida.org.ve/
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 26, Avenida 4 Plaza Bolivar, Merida 5101-A, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (074) 52-5786, 52-4307
  • Fax: 52.12.38

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Mérida
16 February 1778ErectedArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Mérida (erected)
7 March 1863Territory LostDiocese of Mérida Diocese of Barquisimeto (erected)
7 March 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Diocese of Mérida
Diocese of Calabozo (erected)
28 July 1897Territory LostDiocese of Mérida Diocese of Zulia (erected)
12 October 1922Territory LostDiocese of Mérida Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela (erected)
Archdiocese of Mérida
11 June 1923ElevatedDiocese of Mérida Archdiocese of Mérida
4 June 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Mérida Diocese of Trujillo (erected)
23 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Calabozo
Archdiocese of Mérida
Diocese of Barinas (erected)
7 July 1994Territory LostDiocese of Cabimas
Archdiocese of Maracaibo
Archdiocese of Mérida
Diocese of El Vigia-San Carlos del Zulia (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Mérida
1950454,000455,00099.8%6524895,1014813277ap1951
1966261,200262,00099.7%5232843,1092813938ap1967
1970260,000270,66896.1%4133743,5133820441ap1971
1976377,000380,00099.2%6230924,0974420654ap1977
1980446,000450,00099.1%5724815,5063119047ap1981
1990607,000612,39699.1%60401006,0705624565ap1991
1999533,072543,54598.1%75371124,7595520051ap2000
2000543,487554,93197.9%6026866,31924323251ap2001
2001547,349564,27797.0%78361144,80125423252ap2002
2002516,341573,71290.0%78371154,48926023754ap2003
2003530,798589,77590.0%86391254,24626924061ap2004
2004543,118603,46490.0%84441284,24336726962ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014