Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Agustín de Alvarado y Castillo

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1720BornLimpias, Spain
7 Sep 177252.2AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
May 1773²52.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
13 Mar 177554.7AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
2 Jun 177655.9InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
14 Dec 177858.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
21 Jul 178161.0DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agustín de Alvarado y Castillo:
Archbishop Agustín de Alvarado y Castillo (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,493
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 90, Number 460
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015