Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Ordóñez y Flórez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
19 Apr 161050.2AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
21 Dec 161151.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
11 Jun 161454.4DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ordóñez y Flórez
Archbishop Pedro Ordóñez y Flórez (born 1560, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrozas, Spain

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 128, Number 813
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast