Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Javier de Arauz y Rojas

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1691¹BornQuito
29 Sep 174655.7SelectedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
28 Nov 174655.9ConfirmedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
21 Sep 174756.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
13 Apr 175362.2SelectedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
28 May 175362.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
29 Feb 176473.1DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Javier de Arauz y Rojas:
Archbishop José Javier de Arauz y Rojas (born 1691, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 216, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015