Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio de Urbina, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1632³BornBurgos, Spain
7 Nov 168957.3AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
14 May 169057.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
18 Apr 170168.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
9 Apr 170370.7DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio de Urbina:
Archbishop Ignacio de Urbina O.S.H. (born , died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 232, Number 1,443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013