Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Herrán y Zaldúa

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1797BornHonda
3 Jun 182124.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 183436.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
13 Jan 185456.9AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
15 Apr 185558.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
6 Feb 186871.0DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Herrán y Zaldúa:
Archbishop Antonio Herrán y Zaldúa (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 271
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013