Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo Rubio Diaz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1901BornBogotá
7 Nov 192624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
7 Jul 195351.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
7 Jul 195351.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
13 Sep 195351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vallis
29 May 195654.5AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
12 Feb 196159.2AppointedBishop of Sonsón, Colombia
27 Mar 196866.3AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
28 Feb 197876.2RetiredArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
19 Aug 199290.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Rubio Diaz:
Archbishop Alfredo Rubio Diaz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013