Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Caro Borda

Bishop Emeritus of Soacha, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1939 Born
15 Aug 196323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Zipaquirá, Colombia
21 Jul 200060.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
21 Jul 200060.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
19 Sep 200060.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusibisir
6 Aug 200363.6AppointedBishop of Soacha, Colombia
14 Sep 200363.7InstalledBishop of Soacha, Colombia
29 Jun 201676.5RetiredBishop of Soacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Caro Borda
Bishop Daniel Caro Borda (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Soacha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé de Bogotá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Soacha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,834
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast