Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Aníbal Cardinal Muñoz Duque

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1908Born
19 Nov 193325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
8 Apr 195142.5AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
27 May 195142.6Ordained BishopBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
18 Dec 195244.2AppointedBishop of Bucaramanga, Colombia
3 Aug 195950.8AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
27 Mar 196859.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bogotá, Colombia
27 Mar 196859.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cariana
5 Feb 196960.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
29 Jul 197263.8SucceededArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
30 Jul 197263.8AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military
5 Mar 197364.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197364.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
25 Jun 198475.7RetiredArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
25 Jun 198475.7RetiredBishop of Colombia, Military
15 Jan 198778.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Aníbal Muñoz Duque
Aníbal Cardinal Muñoz Duque (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rosa de Osos

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jun 2017