Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona

Archidioecesis Neo-Pampilonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Madrid Merlano, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 May 1956
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 6,571 (2,538 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Carrera 5, Calle 5 N. 4-87, Pamplona, Colombia
  • Telephone: (975)68.28.86
  • Fax: 68.45.40

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nueva Pamplona
25 September 1835ErectedArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Nueva Pamplona (erected)
20 March 1895Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Diocese of Socorro (erected)
2 April 1928Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona
Diocese of Socorro y San Gil
Territorial Prelature of Río Magdalena (erected)
1 August 1951Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Territorial Prelature of Bertrania en el Catatumbo (erected)
17 December 1952Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Diocese of Bucaramanga (erected)
29 May 1956Territory LostDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Diocese of Cúcuta (erected)
Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona
29 May 1956ElevatedDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nueva Pamplona
1950645,960646,47199.9%130651953,3123617465ap1951
Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona
1966165,252165,62799.8%688762,1741922924ap1967
1970149,500150,00099.7%663692,166512525ap1971
1976145,000150,00096.7%52522,78815426ap1977
1980238,284250,92095.0%49494,86215526ap1981
1990292,596303,60096.4%47476,22512827ap1991
1999221,926234,96794.4%63633,5229029ap2000
2000210,000234,96789.4%65653,2309534ap2001
2001205,000213,04296.2%71712,8879234ap2002
2002201,529210,00096.0%72722,7998934ap2003
2003197,944203,59697.2%68682,91011134ap2004
2004192,207197,59497.3%67672,8687934ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 2 Apr 2013