Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Severo Garcia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tunja, Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1808¹Born
14 Nov 183022.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Nov 188173.8AppointedBishop of Tunja, Colombia
12 Mar 188274.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tunja, Colombia
19 Apr 188678.2ResignedBishop of Tunja, Colombia
4 Feb 188880.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcis in Syria
16 Mar 189082.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tunja, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Severo Garcia
Archbishop Severo Garcia (born 1808, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tunja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomondoco, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tunja, Diocese of Tunja
Death PlaceTunja, Diocese of Tunja

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198, and Page 572
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,882, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast