Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Buenaventura Jáuregui Prieto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zipaquirá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1898BornCogua
29 Jun 192324.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 195153.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
5 Dec 195153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
2 Feb 195253.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
8 Dec 195759.0AppointedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
8 Jul 197475.6RetiredBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
7 Mar 198384.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Zipaquirá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Buenaventura Jáuregui Prieto:
Bishop Buenaventura Jáuregui Prieto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zipaquirá

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 1 Dec 2013