Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julián de Cortázar

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1576BornDurango, Spain
10 Apr 161741.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 Dec 161842.9Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
7 Apr 162549.2AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
4 Jul 162751.4InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
31 Oct 163054.8DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julián de Cortázar:
Archbishop Julián de Cortázar (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187, and Page 348
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 135, Number 865

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015